This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/25/2023 at 19:09:15 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC. V WASHINGTON, JEANETTE

Case Summary

On 02/13/2023 SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WASHINGTON, JEANETTE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC.

Respondent and Defendant

WASHINGTON , JEANETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

GORDON , ANDRIENE TREASURE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/13/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

02/13/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/13/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4777710

02/14/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4777710

ANSWER

02/15/2023:ANSWER

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/17/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF FILING

02/22/2023:NOTICE OF FILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 3/1/23

03/01/2023:ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 3/1/23

ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT 4/4/2023 AT 1:30 PM COURTROOM 2 SIGNED BY JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 3/1/2023

03/01/2023:ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT 4/4/2023 AT 1:30 PM COURTROOM 2 SIGNED BY JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 3/1/2023

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

03/02/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR COURT TO VACATE ORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT RENT INTO COURT REGISTRY F/B DFT

03/03/2023:MOTION FOR COURT TO VACATE ORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT RENT INTO COURT REGISTRY F/B DFT

REPLY/RESPONSE

03/06/2023:REPLY/RESPONSE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY/RESPONSE; Notes: TO MOTION TO VACATE ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR COURT TO VACATE ORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT RENT INTO COURT REGISTRY F/B DFT; Notes: FOR COURT TO VACATE ORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT RENT INTO COURT REGISTRY F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B ANDRIENE TREASURE GORDON OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT 4/4/2023 AT 1:30 PM COURTROOM 2 SIGNED BY JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 3/1/2023; Notes: SCHEDULING MEDIATION AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT 4/4/2023 AT 1:30 PM COURTROOM 2 SIGNED BY JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 3/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 3/1/23; Notes: DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 3/1/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JEANETTE WASHINGTON - 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes: JEANETTE WASHINGTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: TO EVICTION F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4777710; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/14/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/14/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4777710; Notes: $195.00 4777710 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less