This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/10/2022 at 19:30:52 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC V SMITH, JAQUANDA

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SMITH, JAQUANDA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

SMITH , JAQUANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/01/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

08/01/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4558146

08/01/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4558146

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/05/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/09/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

08/18/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/18/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

08/22/2022:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33797 PAGE 1798-1798

08/22/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33797 PAGE 1798-1798

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

08/24/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/30/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO JAQUANDA SMITH. SERVED ON 8/26/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33797 PAGE 1798-1798; Notes: JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 8/22/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: FB PLT- AG DFT JAQUANDA SMITH ( CLERK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: FB PLT - JAQUANDA SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OP FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAQUANDA SMITH - 08/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MNICHOLS1985@BELLSOUTH.NET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4558146; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/01/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/01/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4558146; Notes: $195.00 4558146 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC is a litigant