This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 22:39:23 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC V ROY, TALITA

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROY, TALITA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC

Respondent and Defendant

ROY , TALITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

11/28/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4692965

11/29/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4692965

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/05/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/13/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

01/03/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/03/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

01/05/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

JUDGMENT BOOK 34062 PAGE 388-388

01/09/2023:JUDGMENT BOOK 34062 PAGE 388-388

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

01/12/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/23/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO TALITA ROY SERVED ON 01/16/2023 VIA POSTED EXECUTED ON 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BOOK 34062 PAGE 388-388; Notes: FOR POSSESSION JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 1/9/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: AS TO DFT TALITA ROY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AS TO TALITA ROY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TAUTA ROY - 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4692965; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/29/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4692965; Notes: $195.00 4692965 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MNICHOLS1985@BELLSOUTH.NET E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less