This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/28/2022 at 15:26:50 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC V ROY, TALITA

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROY, TALITA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC

Respondent and Defendant

ROY , TALITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

11/28/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4692965

11/29/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4692965

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/05/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/13/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TAUTA ROY - 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4692965; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/29/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4692965; Notes: $195.00 4692965 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MNICHOLS1985@BELLSOUTH.NET E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONTGOMERY, THOMAS