This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/04/2023 at 19:03:19 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC V MCCRAE, MARYKATE

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MCCRAE, MARYKATE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

MCCRAE , MARYKATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

KENNEDY , RASHIDA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/23/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

02/23/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/23/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4790361

02/24/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4790361

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/02/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/06/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/10/2023:MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/10/2023:MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY F/B DFT

03/10/2023:MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY F/B DFT

ORDER SETTING HEARING

03/13/2023:ORDER SETTING HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: 4/18/23 @1:30PM RM 2 JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 3/13/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY F/B DFT; Notes: TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes: DFT'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED MARYKATE MCCRAE - 03/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4790361; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4790361; Notes: $195.00 4790361 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less