This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/28/2023 at 19:01:19 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC V MATHIS, SHARON

Case Summary

On 02/16/2023 SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MATHIS, SHARON. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

MATHIS , SHARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KORTE , BRIAN K

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/16/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

02/16/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED THE PROPERTY ZIP CODE IS 33430 MISSING THE 0

02/16/2023:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED THE PROPERTY ZIP CODE IS 33430 MISSING THE 0

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4782872

02/17/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4782872

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/21/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/02/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE FB DFT- OF UPDATING MAILING ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANTS AND OBJECTION TO ANY CLAIM ON SECURITY DEPOSIT

03/06/2023:NOTICE FB DFT- OF UPDATING MAILING ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANTS AND OBJECTION TO ANY CLAIM ON SECURITY DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

03/06/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/06/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/09/2023:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/14/2023:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER SETTING HEARING

03/16/2023:ORDER SETTING HEARING

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT -JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 3/16/23

03/16/2023:ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT -JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 3/16/23

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT -JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 3/16/23; Notes: MOTION TO VACATE ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT -JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 3/16/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: MEDIATION AND FINAL HEARING ON POSSESSION 4/18/2023 AT 1:30 P.M. - SIGNED JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 3/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: FB PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SHARON MATHIS - 03/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: FB DFT'S ATTY BRIAN KORTE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FB DFT- OF UPDATING MAILING ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANTS AND OBJECTION TO ANY CLAIM ON SECURITY DEPOSIT; Notes: FB DFT- OF UPDATING MAILING ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANTS AND OBJECTION TO ANY CLAIM ON SECURITY DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com AS TO SHARON MATHIS EMAILED TO PLTS ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4782872; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/17/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/17/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4782872; Notes: $195.00 4782872 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED THE PROPERTY ZIP CODE IS 33430 MISSING THE 0; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com THE PROPERTY ZIP CODE IS 33430 MISSING THE 0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less