*********************X-WB
12/14/2022
Disposed - Other Disposed
Property - Residential Eviction
Palm Beach, Florida
ALIJEWICZ , SARA
SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC
JACKSON , SHANNON
MONTGOMERY , THOMAS
12/14/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET
12/14/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION
12/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED
12/15/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4712901
12/19/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
12/20/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
01/04/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT
01/04/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT
01/09/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT
01/10/2023:JUDGMENT BOOK 34064 PAGE 1925-1925
01/19/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED
01/25/2023:SERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED
DocketSERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED; Notes: AS TO SHANNON JACKSON. POSTED ON 1/20/23; UNEXECUTED.
[-] Read LessDocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes
[-] Read LessDocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT
[-] Read LessDocketJUDGMENT BOOK 34064 PAGE 1925-1925; Notes: FOR POSSESSION -JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 1/10/23
[-] Read LessDocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: BY CLERK AGAINST SHANNON JACKSON F/B PLT
[-] Read LessDocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: SHANNON JACKSON F/B PLT
[-] Read LessDocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes
[-] Read LessDocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SHANNON JACKSON - 12/15/2022
[-] Read LessFinancialReceipt Number: 4712901; Receipt Amount: $195.00
[-] Read LessFinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 12/15/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 12/15/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessDocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4712901; Notes: $195.00 4712901 Fully Paid
[-] Read LessDocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes
[-] Read Less