This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/13/2023 at 15:35:03 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC V HAMMOND, CYNTHIA

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HAMMOND, CYNTHIA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAPPHIRE BELLE, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

HAMMOND , CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/14/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

12/14/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4712409

12/15/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4712409

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/19/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/20/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER

12/20/2022:ANSWER

ORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY $1000.00 NO LATER THAN 4:00 PM ON 1/10/23 ; JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 1/3/23

01/03/2023:ORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY $1000.00 NO LATER THAN 4:00 PM ON 1/10/23 ; JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 1/3/23

MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT. F/B DFT

01/10/2023:MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT. F/B DFT

PAID $1,022.50 ON RECEIPT 4738076

01/10/2023:PAID $1,022.50 ON RECEIPT 4738076

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4738076; Receipt Amount: $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4738076; Receipt Amount: $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4738076; Receipt Amount: $22.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $1,217.50; total Amount Paid: $1,217.50; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/10/2023; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $22.50; Amount Paid: $22.50; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/10/2023; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $1,000.00; Amount Paid: $1,000.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $1,022.50 ON RECEIPT 4738076; Notes: $1,022.50 4738076 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT. F/B DFT; Notes: TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT. F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY $1000.00 NO LATER THAN 4:00 PM ON 1/10/23 ; JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 1/3/23; Notes: DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY $1000.00 NO LATER THAN 4:00 PM ON 1/10/23 ; JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 1/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: F/B DFT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CYNTHIA HAMMOND - 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4712409; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/15/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/15/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4712409; Notes: $195.00 4712409 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less