This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 22:39:13 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC V BELL, KAENEISHA L

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BELL, KAENEISHA L. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC

Respondent and Defendant

BELL , KAENEISHA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

11/28/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4692979

11/29/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4692979

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/05/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

STIPULATION

12/05/2022:STIPULATION

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34006 PAGE 1847-1847

12/07/2022:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34006 PAGE 1847-1847

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34006 PAGE 1847-1847; Notes: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL DTD: 12/07/22 JUDGE ALIJEWICZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Notes: FOR SETTLEMENT WITH JUDGMENT UPON DEFAULT F/B PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KAENEISHA L BELL - 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4692979; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/29/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4692979; Notes: $195.00 4692979 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MNICHOLS1985@BELLSOUTH.NET E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less