This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/25/2023 at 19:03:19 (UTC).

SAN MARINO AT TOWN CENTER APARTMENTS V SILVA, LORAINE

Case Summary

On 01/16/2023 SAN MARINO AT TOWN CENTER APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SILVA, LORAINE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

SAN MARINO AT TOWN CENTER APARTMENTS

SANMAR REALTY INVESTMENTS LIMITED LLC

Defendant and Respondent

SILVA , LORAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/16/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/16/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/16/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4745473

01/17/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4745473

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/20/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/23/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/26/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: FB PLT-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED LORAINE SILVA - 01/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4745473; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/17/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/17/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4745473; Notes: $195.00 4745473 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less