This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/09/2022 at 10:01:51 (UTC).

SAMUELS, DREW T V AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE INC

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 SAMUELS, DREW T filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SAMUELS , DREW T

Respondents and Defendants

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE INC

PRITCHARD , MARK ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

DELORENZO , CHRISTOPHER

QURAISHI , MAAZ AHMAD

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

CACCIPPIO , THERESA S

CHRISTENSEN , JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/16/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4505631

06/17/2022:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4505631

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/20/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/23/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/28/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/05/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/14/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/25/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/26/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/27/2022:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/27/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/27/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: DEFENDANTS. I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: DEFENDANTS. I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DATED JULY 25, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 F/B ATTY CACCIPPIO OBO DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B ATTY THERESA S CACCIPPIO OBO DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE PURSUANT TO FLA R JUD ADMIN 2.516 F/B ATTY CHRISTENSEN OBO DFT MARK ANTHONY PRICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED AMENDED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE MARK ANTHONY PRICHARD - 06/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE, INC - 06/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $421.00; total Amount Paid: $421.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/17/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/17/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/17/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4505631; Notes: $421.00 4505631 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mquraishi@righttojustice.com;cdelorenzo@righttojustice.com;shansen@righttojustice.com ISSUED TO AMERICAN MEDICAL AMBULANCE SERVICE INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mquraishi@righttojustice.com;cdelorenzo@righttojustice.com;shansen@righttojustice.com ISSUED TO MARK ANTHONY PRITCHARD EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELORENZO ESQ, CHRISTOPHER J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QURAISHI , MAAZ AHMAD