This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 17:13:16 (UTC).

SAINTYL, REBECCA V SAINTYL, GUY

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 SAINTYL, REBECCA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAINTYL, GUY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEEVER-AGRAMA , DINA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEEVER-AGRAMA , DINA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SAINTYL , REBECCA

Defendant and Respondent

SAINTYL , GUY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

METSCH , LAWERENCE R

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SINCKLER , NATASHIA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4460498; Receipt Amount: $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $714.00; total Amount Paid: $714.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/11/2022; Description: 7CTP CA Family Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due: $295.00; Amount Paid: $295.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPAID $295.00 ON RECEIPT 4460498; Notes: $295.00 4460498 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketSOC SEC NO FILED; Notes: F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes: WITHIN COURT FILING F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes: F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes: F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCOUNTERCLAIM; Notes: ANSWER AND COUNTER-PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/13/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4425907; Notes: $10.00 4425907 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: l.metsch@metsch.com;j.proenza@metsch.com TO BE SERVED ON GUY SAINTYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4421515; Receipt Amount: $409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/11/2022; Description: 700FF Family Dissolution of Marriage PB_070117PB; Amount Due: $409.00; Amount Paid: $409.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPAID $409.00 ON RECEIPT 4421515; Notes: $409.00 4421515 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: FH: Family North County - FH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes: FILED BY ATTY METSCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketPETITION; Notes: FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED BY ATTY METSCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Metsch, Lawrence R.