This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 04:50:07 (UTC).

SADHU, DIANE V ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 SADHU, DIANE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILLMAN , PAIGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILLMAN , PAIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SADHU , DIANE

SADHU , ROHIT

Defendant and Respondent

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHOCHET , RANDALL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/15/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/15/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/15/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/15/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4390522

03/18/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4390522

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

03/31/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4390522; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4390522; Notes:$411.00 4390522 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/17/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/17/2022; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:attorneys@counsel.insure;dnorton@shochetlaw.com ISSUED TO ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St Johns Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shochet, Randall M, ESQ.