This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 22:55:09 (UTC).

RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC V BUSOT, JORGE BRAVO

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BUSOT, JORGE BRAVO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

Defendants and Respondents

BRANDAO BRAVO , FERNANDA

BUSOT , JORGE BRAVO

UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 2

UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 3

VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCOTT , JENNIFER M

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ROOKS , ASHTON

ROSSIN , ALLEN E

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

06/01/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/01/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/26/2022:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/25/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

05/25/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/19/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

05/17/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/10/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/10/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $958.10 ON RECEIPT 4451048

05/03/2022:PAID $958.10 ON RECEIPT 4451048

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

04/29/2022:LIS PENDENS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/29/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/29/2022:COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: PURSUANT FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 F/B ATTY ALLEN E ROSSIN OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. - 05/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFTS FERNANDA BRANDA-BRAVO AND JORGE BRAVO BUSOT A/K/A JORGE BRAVO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: OBO DFTS FERNANDA BRANDAO-BRAVO AND JORGE BRAVO BUSOT F/B ATTY A ROOKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JORGE BRAVO BUSOT A/K/A JORGE BRAVO - 05/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE FERNANDA BRANDAO-BRAVO - 05/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4451048; Receipt Amount: $958.10

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: foreclosureservice@kasslaw.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: foreclosureservice@kasslaw.com ISSUED TO FERNANDA BRANDAO BRAVO EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: foreclosureservice@kasslaw.com ISSUED TO VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: foreclosureservice@kasslaw.com ISSUED TO JORGE BRAVO BUSOT AKA BRAVO EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33538 PAGE 644-644; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: DUPLICATE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Rushmore Loan Management Service LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott, Jennifer Mouser