Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/08/2021 at 13:04:15 (UTC).

RONDON, STEPHANIE V ORTEGA, CARLOS

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 RONDON, STEPHANIE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ORTEGA, CARLOS. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEESMAN , MAXINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHEESMAN , MAXINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RONDON , STEPHANIE

Defendant and Respondent

ORTEGA , CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLY ESQ, ROBERT P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketORDER TO PICK UP MINOR CHILD(REN) DTD 01-21-21 CHEESMAN; Notes:TO PICK UP MINOR CHILD(REN) DTD 01-21-21 CHEESMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING AMENDED ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY HEARING ON EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR CHILD PICK-UP ORDER ( ORDER AMENDED TO ADD COURT ADDRESS) DTD 01/14/2020 JUDGE FRANCIS; Notes:AMENDED ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY HEARING ON EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR CHILD PICK-UP ORDER ( ORDER AMENDED TO ADD COURT ADDRESS) DTD 01/14/2020 JUDGE FRANCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILED DUPLICATE FILING; Notes:ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING VERIFIED FOR CHILD PICK UP ORDER DTD 01/14/21 JUDGE FRANCIS; Notes:VERIFIED FOR CHILD PICK UP ORDER DTD 01/14/21 JUDGE FRANCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST; Notes:FOR EMERGENCY HRG F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION; Notes:VERIFIED FOR CHILD PICK UP ORDER F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER F/B ATTY KELLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3860642; Receipt Amount: $20.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$20.15; total Amount Paid:$20.15; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAPPL AND AFF OF INDIGENCY; Notes:FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketORDER/PARENT CLASS-AO 5.212; Notes:FILED BY COC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIVIL DATE OF BIRTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:CARLOS SHALIMAR ORTEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Notes:FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR PATERNITY; Notes:FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPAID $20.15 ON RECEIPT 3860642; Notes:$20.15 3860642 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE RELATED TO DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY ACTION; Notes:RELATED TO DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FA: Family Central - FA (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FD: Family Central - FD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT P KELLY