This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2021 at 17:39:22 (UTC).

ROESSLER, BEATRICE

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 ROESSLER, BEATRICE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

KORR , DAVID

KORR , GARY

Decedent

ROESSLER , BEATRICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

PONNOCK , ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Notes:SIGNED BY JUDGE KERNER ON FEB 17, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:AND APPOINTING PR SIGNED BY JUDGE KERNER ON FEB 17, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPROBATE CHECKLIST; Notes:OPENING CHECKLIST FOR PETITION FOR ADMIN F/B JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPROOF; Notes:OF WILL F/B GARY KORR AKA GARRY KORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3901346; Receipt Amount: $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$404.50; total Amount Paid:$404.50; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/08/2021; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$3.50; Amount Paid:$3.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPAID $3.50 ON RECEIPT 3901346; Notes:$3.50 3901346 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSTATUS ORDER; Notes:SIGNED BY JUDGE KERNER ON FEB 5, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPROBATE CHECKLIST; Notes:OPENING CHECKLIST FOR PETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION OF TESTATE ESTATE F/B JUDGE L LAURIE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:ANDY@PONNOCKLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:F/B DAVID KORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY F/B GARY KORR AKA GARRY KORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY F/B DAVID KORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PR, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B GARY KORR AKA GARRY KORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PR, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B DAVID KORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B PETITIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IZ: South Branch Probate - IZ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PONNOCK , ANDREW