This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/29/2022 at 22:44:58 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, MARIA L V DARDEN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 RODRIGUEZ, MARIA L filed an Other lawsuit against DARDEN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ , MARIA L

Defendants and Respondents

DARDEN CORPORATION

DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC

FLORIDA SE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

POVEDA , MIGUEL ANGEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MILLER , KENNETH J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/20/2022:COMPLAINT

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED

05/20/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED

05/20/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED

05/20/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED

PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4476764

05/24/2022:PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4476764

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/02/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/02/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/02/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/03/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/27/2022:MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/29/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/29/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (MOTION CALENDAR 07/26/2022 08:30:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING 07/26/2022 08:30:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes: PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC AND FLORIDA SE LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - F/B ATTY KENNETH MILLER OBO DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC AND FLORIDA SE LLC DBA THE OLIVE GARDEN #1576

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FLORIDA SE, LLC - 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DARDEN CORPORATION - 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC - 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: povedalaw@gmail.com;mikepoveda@gmail.com AS TO DFT FLORIDA SE LLC DBA THE OLIVE GARDEN #1576

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: povedalaw@gmail.com;mikepoveda@gmail.com AS TO DFT DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: povedalaw@gmail.com;mikepoveda@gmail.com AS TO DFT DARDEN CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/24/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/24/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/24/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4476764; Notes: $431.00 4476764 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED; Notes: povedalaw@gmail.com;mikepoveda@gmail.com STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED; Notes: povedalaw@gmail.com;mikepoveda@gmail.com STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED; Notes: povedalaw@gmail.com;mikepoveda@gmail.com STANDING ORDER PURSUANT TO AO 3.107 NOT ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DARDEN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FLORIDA SE LLC INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA OLIVE GARDEN is a litigant

Latest cases where DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POVEDA , MIGUEL ANGEL