This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/09/2022 at 22:49:49 (UTC).

RODOWICZ, WANDA V WALMART STORES INC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 RODOWICZ, WANDA filed an Other lawsuit against WALMART STORES INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RODOWICZ JR, STANLEY

RODOWICZ , WANDA

Defendants and Respondents

TILLER , CARRIE

WALMART STORES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WASSERMAN , MICHAEL A

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MANZO , CHRISTINE MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/25/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/18/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/18/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/14/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/14/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/14/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/14/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/14/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/14/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/30/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/30/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/30/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/30/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/30/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED ONE DFT PER SUMMONS

06/30/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED ONE DFT PER SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

06/30/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: TO AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B DFTS WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY MANZO OBO DFT WALMART STORES EAST LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B ATTY MANZO OBO DFT WALMART STORES EAST LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: (NOTICE OF SERVING INSURANCE) TO DFT CARRIE TILLER F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: (NOTICE OF SERVING INSURANCE) TO DFT WALMART STORES EAST LP A FOREIGN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: (NOTICE OF SERVING PREMISES) TO DFT CARRIE TILLER F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: (NOTICE OF SERVING PREMISES) TO DFT WALMART STORES EAST LP A FOREIGN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: TO DFT CARRIE TILLER F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: TO DFT WALMART STORES EAST LP A FOREIGN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: (PREMISES) TO DFT CARRIE TILLER F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: INSURANCE TO DFT WALMART STORES INC F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: INSURANCE TO DFT CARRIE TILLER F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: TO DFT WALMART STORES INC F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: TO DFT CARRIE TILLER F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PREMISES TO DFT WALMART STORES INC F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT CARRIE TILLER F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mwasserman@800goldlaw.com;kbellucci@800goldlaw.com;aross@800goldlaw.com AS TO WALMART STORES INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED ONE DFT PER SUMMONS; Notes: mwasserman@800goldlaw.com;kbellucci@800goldlaw.com;aross@800goldlaw.com ONE DFT PER SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WASSERMAN, MICHAEL ADAM