This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/12/2021 at 16:33:52 (UTC).

RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC V DELEO, LISA C

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DELEO, LISA C. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROWE , CYMONIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROWE , CYMONIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

UNKOWN TENANT

DELEO , LISA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

EISENBERG , AMY O

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/24/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS BOOK 31790 PAGE 1990-1990

09/24/2020:LIS PENDENS BOOK 31790 PAGE 1990-1990

COMPLAINT

09/24/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $436.60 ON RECEIPT 3758155

09/29/2020:PAID $436.60 ON RECEIPT 3758155

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/20/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

10/20/2020:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/20/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

10/20/2020:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/20/2020:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 31971 PAGE 1710-1710

11/30/2020:RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 31971 PAGE 1710-1710

PAID $10.60 ON RECEIPT 3827683

12/01/2020:PAID $10.60 ON RECEIPT 3827683

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3827683; Receipt Amount: $10.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$447.20; total Amount Paid:$447.20; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/01/2020; Description:VDAL Voluntary Dismissal Legal Description; Amount Due:$0.60; Amount Paid:$0.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/01/2020; Description:VD1P Volun Diss 1st Page $10.00; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.60 ON RECEIPT 3827683; Notes:$10.60 3827683 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes:DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 31971 PAGE 1710-1710; Notes:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVRR LISA C DELEO FKA LISA DELEO SANDERS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN H DELEO RESIDUARY TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE LISA C DELEO FKA LISA DELEO SANDERS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN H DELEO RESIDUARY TRUST - 10/1/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:09/29/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:09/29/2020; Description:800F1 CircCivil Real Prop $50,000 or < PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $436.60 ON RECEIPT 3758155; Notes:$436.60 3758155 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM;AEISENBERG@KBRLEGAL.COM AS TO LISA C DELEO F/K/A LISA DELEO SANDERS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN H DELEO RESIDUARY TRUST EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com AS TO LISA C DELEO EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31790 PAGE 1990-1990; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISENBERG , AMY O