This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 05:04:32 (UTC).

RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC V CHRISTIANSEN, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHRISTIANSEN, RICHARD. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILLMAN , PAIGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILLMAN , PAIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

CHRISTIANSEN , RICHARD

CHRISTIANSEN , ANGELA

UNKNOWN TENANT

CHRISTIANSEN , KENNETH A

CHRISTIANSEN , MICHAEL P

DEZAGO , LORI

Guardian Ad Litem

TOTH , DINNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

EISENBERG , AMY O

GREEN , KAREN A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

03/11/2022:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

03/01/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

RETURNED MAIL

02/22/2022:RETURNED MAIL

CLERK'S DEFAULT

02/17/2022:CLERK'S DEFAULT

ORDER OF DEFAULT

02/15/2022:ORDER OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

02/07/2022:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/07/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/01/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

02/01/2022:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

01/20/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

RETURNED MAIL

01/18/2022:RETURNED MAIL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/13/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

01/13/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/13/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/13/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

RETURNED MAIL

01/13/2022:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

01/13/2022:RETURNED MAIL

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

01/11/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Notes:EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; KGREEN@KBRLEGAL.COM AS TO DFT LORI DEZAGO, AS HEIR OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:MOTION FOR DEFAULT LORI DEZAGO, AS HEIR OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN, DECEASED CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:LORI DEZAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; KGREEN@KBRLEGAL.COM KENNETH A CHRISTIANSEN AS HEIR OF RICHARD A CHRISTIANSEN DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DEFAULT; Notes:GILLMAN; IS GRANTED AGAINST MICHAEL P CHRISTIANSEN AS HEIR OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN DECEASED DTD 2/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION; Notes:NOTICE OF ACTION F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:(JUDICIAL) AS TO DFT MICHAEL P. CHRISTIANSEN, AS HEIR OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN, DECEASED F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:MOTION FOR DEFAULT PLAINTIFF, RIVERWALKOFTHEPALMBEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., MOVES KENNETH A. CHRISTIANSEN CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Notes:EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; KGREEN@KBRLEGAL.COM AS TO DFT MICHAEL P CHRISTIANSEN AS HEIR OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION; Notes:TO LORI DEZAGO AS HEIR OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN DECEASED LKA 7852 NILE RIVER ROAD WEST PALM BEACH FLF 33411 PUBLISH IN PBDBR 1/28/2022 & 2/4/2022 MANDATORY 2/28/2022 **COPIES PROVIDED FOR MAILING**

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/26/2021; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/26/2021; Description:800F1 CircCivil Real Prop $50,000 or < PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $436.60 ON RECEIPT 4001512; Notes:$436.60 4001512 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com AS TO ANGELA CHRISTIANSEN EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com AS TO RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32430 PAGE 656-656; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAREN ANN GREEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISENBERG , AMY O