This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 01/15/2021 at 17:34:03 (UTC).

RICH LEE INVESTMENTS, LLC V SAJA PROPERTIES, INC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 RICH LEE INVESTMENTS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SAJA PROPERTIES, INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RASKIN , RICHARD

RICH LEE INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendants and Respondents

MARTINEZ , JASON

SAJA PROPERTIES, INC

RASKIN , LAWERENCE

MARTINEZ , SANTIAGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHAW , JORDAN A

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CHAPMAN , AVERY S

SABLON , MONICA B

HOLTZ ESQ, SCOTT H

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT

01/07/2021:RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT

CERTIFIED COPY

01/07/2021:CERTIFIED COPY

CERTIFIED COPY

01/07/2021:CERTIFIED COPY

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT FOURTH DISTRICT OF APPEAL ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF NEW CASE

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT FOURTH DISTRICT OF APPEAL ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF NEW CASE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT FOURTH DISTRICT OF APPEAL ORDER TO APPEALLANT

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT FOURTH DISTRICT OF APPEAL ORDER TO APPEALLANT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT AGREED ORDER

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT AGREED ORDER

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF SERVICE

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF SERVICE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT AGREED ORDER

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT AGREED ORDER

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF SERVICE

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF SERVICE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT SAJA PROPERTIES, INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT SAJA PROPERTIES, INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF SERVICE

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF SERVICE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS

01/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3863358

01/05/2021:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3863358

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION JOINT MOTION BY ALL DEFENDANTS TO STAY TRIAL COURT PROCEEDINGS PENDING PLAINTIFF'S APPEAL; Notes:JOINT MOTION BY ALL DEFENDANTS TO STAY TRIAL COURT PROCEEDINGS PENDING PLAINTIFF'S APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT; Notes:TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes:JUDGE PHILLIPS TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT CIVIL FROM BROWARD CASE CACE-20-000208 DTD 12/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes:DOCKET SHEET OF BROWARD CASE CACE-20-000208

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3863358; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/05/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT FOURTH DISTRICT OF APPEAL ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF NEW CASE; Notes:FOURTH DISTRICT OF APPEAL ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF NEW CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT FOURTH DISTRICT OF APPEAL ORDER TO APPEALLANT; Notes:FOURTH DISTRICT OF APPEAL ORDER TO APPEALLANT

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDESSES; Notes:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS; Notes:SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT; Notes:COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF SERVICE; Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF SERVICE; Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT SANTIAGO MARTINEZ'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Notes:DEFENDANT SANTIAGO MARTINEZ'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS; Notes:SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS; Notes:SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3863358; Notes:$401.00 3863358 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AH: Circuit Civil Central - AH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shaw, Jordan A, ESQ.