This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/28/2022 at 17:10:41 (UTC).

RICAURTE, JENNIFER L V ZURITA, DARIO EDUARDO

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 RICAURTE, JENNIFER L filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against ZURITA, DARIO EDUARDO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON , LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON , LAURA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

RICAURTE , JENNIFER L

Defendant and Respondent

ZURITA , DARIO EDUARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MARSHALL II, SAMUEL THOMAS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SINCKLER , NATASHIA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JENNIFER L. RICAURTE - 06/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4488516; Receipt Amount: $305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $305.00; total Amount Paid: $305.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/03/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/03/2022; Description: 7CTP CA Family Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due: $295.00; Amount Paid: $295.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketPAID $305.00 ON RECEIPT 4488516; Notes: $305.00 4488516 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes: F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@sincklerlaw.com;natashia@sincklerlaw.com TO BE SERVED ON JENNIFER L RICAURTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes: WITHIN COURT FILING F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketSOC SEC NO FILED; Notes: F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2022; Description: 701FF Civil Filings 39 61 741 742 747 752or753; Amount Due: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pmalaw@att.net TO BE SERVED ON DARIO EDUARDO ZURITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSOC SEC NO FILED; Notes: F/B DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUPPORT; Notes: AND OTHER RELIEF F/B DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCIVIL DATE OF BIRTH; Notes: F/B DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: FD: Family Central - FD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARSHALL, SAMUEL THOMAS II