This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2021 at 17:40:00 (UTC).

REX, DONALD K

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 REX, DONALD K was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURIE , LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LAURIE , LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SALMON , STEPHEN

Decedent

REX , DONALD K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

OSBORNE , R BRAY

OSBORNE JR, R BRAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPAID FUNERAL BILL; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING F/B ATTY FANZLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDISCLOSURE; Notes:OF TRUST BENEFICIARIES F/B ATTY FANZLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketSTATUS ORDER; Notes:SIGNED BY JUDGE LAURIE ON FEB 1, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3875576; Receipt Amount: $346.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$346.00; total Amount Paid:$346.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:502FF Summary Administration $1000 or more; Amount Due:$346.00; Amount Paid:$346.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST; Notes:STEPHEN SALMON, TRUSTEE *COPY EMAILED TO ATTY*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPAID $346.00 ON RECEIPT 3875576; Notes:$346.00 3875576 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B R BRADY OSBORNE, JR OBO PETR, STEPHEN SALMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT F/B STEPHEN SALMON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE DONALD K REX TRUST U/A/D 8/27/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY OSBORNE, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:PROOF OF ASSETS OF DONALD K REX F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:COPY *NOF ATTACHED* F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN; Notes:F/B PETR, STEPHEN SALMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:COPY F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IX: South Branch Probate - IX (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less