Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/20/2019 at 23:16:21 (UTC).

RENE, LOUISDY G V SUCKRAM, CARLTON G

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 RENE, LOUISDY G filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUCKRAM, CARLTON G. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RENE , LOUISDY G

Defendant and Respondent

SUCKRAM , CARLTON G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUILLAUME , BYRNES

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FIORELLO ESQ, MATTHEW A

CORRING , NICOLE E

VANDENBERG , DENNIS A

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30672 PAGE 1955-1955

06/10/2019:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30672 PAGE 1955-1955

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/15/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/08/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

WITNESS LIST

04/24/2019:WITNESS LIST

WITNESS LIST

04/24/2019:WITNESS LIST

WITNESS LIST

04/24/2019:WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

04/03/2019:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM PORTIONS OF THE JUNE 27, THRU AUGUST 9, 2019 TRIAL DOCKET AND EXTEND PRETRIAL DEADLINES (F/B DFT)

03/26/2019:MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM PORTIONS OF THE JUNE 27, THRU AUGUST 9, 2019 TRIAL DOCKET AND EXTEND PRETRIAL DEADLINES (F/B DFT)

ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

02/18/2019:ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

01/30/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

01/22/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

01/14/2019:NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

01/07/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

11/16/2018:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 2911424

11/06/2018:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 2911424

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/02/2018:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/02/2018:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

11/02/2018:COMPLAINT

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30672 PAGE 1955-1955; Notes:J. GOODMAN (FINAL) WITH PREJUDICE. THE ABOVE-STYLE CASE BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLT, LOUS D. RENE, DFT, CARLTON G. SUCKRAM. DTD 6/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:J. GOODMAN DTD 6/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DISPOSED AFTER OTHER; Notes:DAO - DISPOSED AFTER OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION; Notes:FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (F/B PLT AND DFT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER J. GOODMAN DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE DISMISSAL PAPERWORK NO LATER THAN 6/10/19. FAILURE TO COMPLY WILL NECESSITATE COUNSEL FOR PLT & DFT TO APPEAR AT A MANDATORY STATUS CONFERENCE ON 6/12/19 @ 8:30AM CTRM 9A. DTD 6/6/19; Notes:J. GOODMAN DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE DISMISSAL PAPERWORK NO LATER THAN 6/10/19. FAILURE TO COMPLY WILL NECESSITATE COUNSEL FOR PLT & DFT TO APPEAR AT A MANDATORY STATUS CONFERENCE ON 6/12/19 @ 8:30AM CTRM 9A. DTD 6/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION REPORT; Notes:MEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION FOR TRIAL DR RICHARD BAJAKIAN 06/06/2019 02:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF:; Notes:OF RESPONSIBLE ATTY AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA R JUD ADMIN NO 2.516 (B)(A) F/B ATTY DENNIS A VANDENBERG OBO DFT CARLTON G SUCKRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION FOR TRIAL DR. JEFFREY L. KATZELL 06/05/2019 04:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREED ORDER GOODMAN: ON CPE ATTY FOR PLT WILL BE ATTENDING THE CPE ON APRIL 30 2019 AT 1:30 PM * SEE ORD FOR DETAILS * DTD 04/25/19; Notes:GOODMAN: ON CPE ATTY FOR PLT WILL BE ATTENDING THE CPE ON APRIL 30 2019 AT 1:30 PM * SEE ORD FOR DETAILS * DTD 04/25/19

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:bguillaume@byrnesglaw.com;lawyer@byrnesglaw.com;info@byrnesglaw.com AS TO DFT CARLTON G SUCKRAM EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DFT CARLTON G SUCKRAM - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DFT CARLTON G SUCKRAM - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AUTOMOBILE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO DFT CARLTON G SUCKRAM - F/B PLT; Notes:AUTOMOBILE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO DFT CARLTON G SUCKRAM - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:FOR MONEY DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Receipt Number:2911424; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Due Date:11/06/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Due Date:11/06/2018; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIORELLO, MATTHEW ANTHONY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANDENBERG, DENNIS A