Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 15:17:30 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK DBA REGIONS MORTGAGE V SCHALET, SANDRA

Case Summary

On 09/25/2012 REGIONS BANK DBA REGIONS MORTGAGE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SCHALET, SANDRA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERRARA , JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERRARA , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

REGIONS BANK DBA REGIONS MORTGAGE

Defendants and Respondents

SCHALET, SANDRA

COHEN, ERIKA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SANDRA SCHALET

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ERIKA COHEN

MERCEDES BENZ FINANCIAL

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

NATIONAL OIL AND GAS DISTRIBUTORS OF FLORIDA LLC

CANYON LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

COHEN , ERIKA

SCHALET , SANDRA

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DOMBOVARY , ELIZABETH B

ARMOLD , PETER M

MAYERSOHN , LEAH HEATHER

SACHS , MARNI

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WASSERSTEIN , DANIEL

SISKIND ESQ, JEFFREY M

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 @ 8:45AM IN CTRM 4B J KEYSER DTD 08/25/16

08/25/2016:ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 @ 8:45AM IN CTRM 4B J KEYSER DTD 08/25/16

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/02/2016:NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURNED MAIL

03/20/2015:RETURNED MAIL

EMERGENCY MOTION

03/11/2015:EMERGENCY MOTION

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL BOOK 27379 PAGE 172

03/03/2015:AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL BOOK 27379 PAGE 172

EXHIBIT LIST

01/29/2015:EXHIBIT LIST

ORDER

01/09/2015:ORDER

ORDER SETTING HEARING

11/25/2014:ORDER SETTING HEARING

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/03/2014:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER GRANTING

06/30/2014:ORDER GRANTING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/30/2014:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 26586 PAGE 1714

01/29/2014:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 26586 PAGE 1714

STIPULATION

07/17/2013:STIPULATION

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/19/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/19/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/03/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/03/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/03/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (NOTICE) ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING REOPENED CASE R OFTEDAL DTD 8/08/17; Notes:(NOTICE) ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING REOPENED CASE R OFTEDAL DTD 8/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:RESPONSE TO ORDER OF 9-1-16 AND SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY ATTY SISKIND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:RESPONSE TO ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 21, 2016 AND SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY F/B DFTS SCHALET AND COHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON A STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED ON SEP 21 2016 ATTY JEFFREY M SISKIND SHALL PROVIDE THE ADDRESS OF DFT ERICA COHEN AND DOC OF DFT SANDRA SCHALET WITHIN 10 DAYS DTD 09/21/16 J KEYSER; Notes:ON A STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED ON SEP 21 2016 ATTY JEFFREY M SISKIND SHALL PROVIDE THE ADDRESS OF DFT ERICA COHEN AND DOC OF DFT SANDRA SCHALET WITHIN 10 DAYS DTD 09/21/16 J KEYSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:TO ERIKA COHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ERIKA COHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RESETTING; Notes:STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/16 AT 8:45 AM CTRM 4B DTD 08/29/16 J KEYSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 @ 8:45AM IN CTRM 4B J KEYSER DTD 08/25/16; Notes:SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 @ 8:45AM IN CTRM 4B J KEYSER DTD 08/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:8-24-16 AT 8:45AM ROOM 4A FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CONTEMPT; Notes:AGAINST SCHALET AND COHEN FOR FAILURE TO COMPLETE FACT INFORMATION SHEET FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
155 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2016
  • Due Date:02/17/2016; Description:Circuit Civil Reopen Fee; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • Due Date:02/10/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • Due Date:03/27/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Due Date:01/16/2014; Description:Civil Doc Stamps PB; Amount Due:$2,954.70; Amount Paid:$2,954.70; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Due Date:01/16/2014; Description:Civil Foreclosure Online Sale Fee; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Due Date:01/16/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$3,014.70; Amount Paid:$3,014.70; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Due Date:01/06/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$116.50; Amount Paid:$116.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant