This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 10/18/2022 at 22:46:03 (UTC).

RAMSEY, TARA V NXRTBH BAYBERRY LLC

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 RAMSEY, TARA filed an Other lawsuit against NXRTBH BAYBERRY LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

RAMSEY , TARA

Defendant and Respondent

NXRTBH BAYBERRY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

BRESSLER , IAN M

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TOTTEN , PAUL G

BROOKS , JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/08/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/08/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/08/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/08/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/08/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4606484

09/09/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4606484

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/13/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/20/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/03/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY JENNIFER MILLER BROOKS, ESQ AND PAUL G TOTTEN, ESQ ON BEHALF OF DFT NXRTBH BAYBERRY LLC 124656

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC - 09/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4606484; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/09/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/09/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4606484; Notes: $411.00 4606484 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ian@ianbresslerlaw.com;cy@ianbresslerlaw.com;jason@hurtfirm.com ISSUED TO NXRTBH BAYBERRY LLC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT NXRTBH BAYBERRY LLC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DFT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NXRTBH BAYBERRY LLC DBA SEASONS 704 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRESSLER , IAN M