This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/18/2023 at 18:06:35 (UTC).

RAMOS, CRISTINA MARIE V JOHNSON BROS CORPORATION A SOUTHLAND COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 RAMOS, CRISTINA MARIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHNSON BROS CORPORATION A SOUTHLAND COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RAMOS , CRISTINA MARIE

Defendants and Respondents

JOHNSON BROS CORPORATION A SOUTHLAND COMPANY

LAMB , KEITH EDWIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SAUL , STEVEN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CLOSE , JEFFERY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/28/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/28/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/28/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/28/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/28/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/28/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

COMPLAINT

07/28/2022:COMPLAINT

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4555312

07/29/2022:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4555312

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/22/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/22/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/22/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

09/15/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

09/15/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes: DEFENDANT JOHNSON BROS CORPORATION, A SOUTHLAND COMPANY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes: DEFENDANT KEITH EDWIN LAMB'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: F/B DFT JOHNSON BROS CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: F/B DFT JOHNSON BROS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B DFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4555312; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $421.00; total Amount Paid: $421.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/29/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST SET TO DFT KEITH EDWIN LAMB F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST SET TO DFT JOHNSON BROS CORPORATION A SOUTHLAND COMPANY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST OF DOCUMENTS AND TANGIBLE THINGS TO DFT KEITH EDWIN LAMB F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST OF DOCUMENTS AND TANGIBLE THINGS TO DFT JOHNSON BROS CORPORATION A SOUTHLAND COMPANY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST SET TO DFT KEITH EDWIN LAMB F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST SET TO DFT JOHNSON BROS CORPORATION A SOUTHLAND COMPANY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mpascucci@JusticeEarned.com;sgizzie@justiceearned.com;Bdeleon@justiceearned.com AS TO KEITH EDWIN LAMB EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mpascucci@JusticeEarned.com;sgizzie@justiceearned.com;Bdeleon@justiceearned.com AS TO JOHNSON BROS CORPORATION A SOUTHLAND COMPANY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON BROS CORPORATION A SOUTHLAND COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saul, Steven N.