This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/14/2021 at 01:09:25 (UTC).

RAINER, BEATRIZ V SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY LLC

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 RAINER, BEATRIZ filed an Other lawsuit against SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROWE , CYMONIE and CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROWE , CYMONIE

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RAINER , BEATRIZ

RAINER , ISIDORO

Respondents and Defendants

SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY LLC

SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STONE , DAVID

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S DEFAULT

01/12/2021:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/07/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/07/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/14/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/14/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3835669

12/07/2020:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3835669

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3816137

11/18/2020:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3816137

COMPLAINT

11/16/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:LITIGATION@MBLAWPA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:MOTION FOR DEFAULT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:MOTION FOR DEFAULT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE, INC - 12/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY,LLC - 12/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3835669; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/07/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/07/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3835669; Notes:$20.00 3835669 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:litigation@mblawpa.com;ronnie@mblawpa.com;david@mblawpa.com AS TO DFT SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:litigation@mblawpa.com;ronnie@mblawpa.com;david@mblawpa.com AS TO DFT SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3816137; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/18/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3816137; Notes:$401.00 3816137 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schumacher Automotive Delray, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Stone