This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/11/2021 at 15:32:50 (UTC).

QUICKDRY RESTORATION AAO YDALIA MUESES V SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 QUICKDRY RESTORATION AAO YDALIA MUESES filed an Other lawsuit against SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PARNOFIELLO , JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PARNOFIELLO , JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

QUICKDRY RESTORATION AAO YDALIA MUESES

Defendant and Respondent

SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEVIN , YITZHAK S

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/05/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/05/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

11/05/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/05/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU

11/05/2021:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/05/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4239749

11/08/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4239749

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4247172

11/15/2021:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4247172

PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4239749

11/17/2021:PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4239749

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4239749; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4239749; Notes:$300.00 4239749 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketREVISED RECEIPT 4239749; Notes:4239749

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4247172; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/15/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4247172; Notes:$10.00 4247172 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/08/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ylevin@levinlitigation.com;service@levinlitigation.com;nicole@levinlitigation.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4239749; Notes:$310.00 4239749 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU; Notes:ylevin@levinlitigation.com;service@levinlitigation.com;nicole@levinlitigation.com A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST OF DOCUMENTS- E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:FIRST SET- E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUICKDRY RESTORATION AAO LUISTORRIO DIOSA is a litigant

Latest cases where Southern Oak Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVIN , YITZHAK S