This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/10/2022 at 08:06:56 (UTC).

QUALITY SPINE CENTER INC V PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 QUALITY SPINE CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

QUALITY SPINE CENTER INC

Defendant and Respondent

PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALK , KENNETH B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BIEBER , SIONA R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/27/2022:COMPLAINT

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4518119

06/29/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4518119

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

07/28/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEMAND FOR:

07/28/2022:DEMAND FOR:

MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

07/28/2022:MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

OBJECTION

07/28/2022:OBJECTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/28/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

08/02/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE F/B S BIEBER OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Notes: TO ORDER ON AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT; Notes: TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes: JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUBSTITUTE PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION - 07/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4518119; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/29/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 8/2/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 8/2/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4518119; Notes: $185.00 4518119 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY SPINE CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALK ESQ, KENNETH B