This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/07/2021 at 02:12:16 (UTC).

PROVIDENT TRUST GROUP V ESTRADA, EDGAR

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 PROVIDENT TRUST GROUP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESTRADA, EDGAR. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROWE , CYMONIE and CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROWE , CYMONIE

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PROVIDENT TRUST GROUP

Respondents and Defendants

CERRON , VALERIO

SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC

ESTRADA , EDGAR

EEE CONSTRUCTION AND REMODELING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KADYSZEWSKI , RYAN V

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

MARTINEZ , CLARA

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

10/15/2020:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

10/15/2020:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

09/21/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/20/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/09/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/09/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $441.00 ON RECEIPT 3627374

05/13/2020:PAID $441.00 ON RECEIPT 3627374

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

05/12/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT'S VALERIO CERRON AND SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC. RESPONDSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION F/B DFTS VALERIO CERRON AND SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:FILED BY VALERIO CERRON AND SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR VALERIO CERRON AND SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES FILED BY ATTY MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Notes:AS TO EDGAR ESTRADA CS 20-15919 FILED 5-29-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3627374; Receipt Amount: $441.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$441.00; total Amount Paid:$441.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:05/13/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:05/13/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:05/13/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $441.00 ON RECEIPT 3627374; Notes:$441.00 3627374 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:RVKLawfirm@gmail.com AS TO SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:RVKLawfirm@gmail.com AS TO VALERIO CERRON EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:RVKLawfirm@gmail.com AS TO EEE CONSTRUCTION AND REMODELING, INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:RVKLawfirm@gmail.com AS TO EDGAR ESTRADA EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENT TRUST GROUP LLC ON BEHALF OF JOSHUA M PECK SEP IRA ACCOUNT 150700113 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan V Kadyszewski (esq)