This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/31/2019 at 15:07:42 (UTC).

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 1 LLC (2017-1) V PIERRE, JUNIOR

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 1 LLC 2017-1 filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PIERRE, JUNIOR. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS , SHERRI L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS , SHERRI L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 1 LLC (2017-1)

Defendant and Respondent

PIERRE , JUNIOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW E

 

Court Documents

HEARING DISPOSITION SHEET

07/23/2019:HEARING DISPOSITION SHEET

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL

07/22/2019:MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL

ORDER SETTING HEARING

07/16/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING

MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT F/B PLT

07/16/2019:MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT F/B PLT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/15/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/15/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/15/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 3248490

07/15/2019:PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 3248490

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

06/26/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

ORDER RESETTING

07/24/2019:ORDER RESETTING

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

07/18/2019:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/15/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/15/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

PAID $75.30 ON RECEIPT 3241809

07/09/2019:PAID $75.30 ON RECEIPT 3241809

PAID $4,578.48 ON RECEIPT 3241804

07/09/2019:PAID $4,578.48 ON RECEIPT 3241804

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/05/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3225634

06/26/2019:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3225634

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/26/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RESETTING; Notes:MEDIATION AND FINAL HEARING ON POSSESSION FOR 8/6/19 @ 1:30PM, ROOM# 2 WEST COUNTY COURTHOUSE DTD: 7/24/19 JUDGE COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL; Notes:OF MEDIATION AND FINAL HEARING ON POSSESSION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION AND ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ON POSSESSION (ORSH). HEARING DATE 7/23/19 @ 1:30PM IN COURTROOM 2. SIGNED ON 7/16/19 BY JDG S. COLLINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT F/B PLT; Notes:TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:MOTION FOR AN ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT(S)' ANSWER AND ENTERING DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION OF TENANT JUNIOR PIERRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JUNIOR PIERRE - 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:NON-MILITARY SERVICE VERIFICATION JUNIOR PIERRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:COUNSEL'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE JUNIOR PIERRE

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • Receipt Number:3248454; Receipt Amount: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Receipt Number:3241809; Receipt Amount: $75.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Receipt Number:3225634; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$4,924.38; total Amount Paid:$4,924.38; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Due Date:07/15/2019; Description:Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due:$75.00; Amount Paid:$75.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Due Date:07/15/2019; Description:Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due:$4,578.78; Amount Paid:$4,578.78; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Due Date:07/09/2019; Description:Voiding Fee; Amount Due:$75.30; Amount Paid:$75.30; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Due Date:07/09/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$0.30; Amount Paid:$0.30; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Due Date:06/26/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Due Date:06/26/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 14, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGEL MATTHEW EDWARD