This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/08/2021 at 19:57:59 (UTC).

PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE V U LINE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against U LINE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE

Defendant and Respondent

U LINE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

RICH , JOSEPH F

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/04/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/04/2021:COMPLAINT

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4201244

10/06/2021:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4201244

WAIVER

10/26/2021:WAIVER

WAIVER

11/02/2021:WAIVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Notes:WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Notes:WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4201244; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/06/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4201244; Notes:$401.00 4201244 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-Line Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph F Rich Esq