This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/17/2021 at 12:19:07 (UTC).

PRIORITY TOWING INC V MICHAEL A ROMACK CONTRACTING INC

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 PRIORITY TOWING INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL A ROMACK CONTRACTING INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PRIORITY TOWING INC

Defendant and Respondent

MICHAEL A ROMACK CONTRACTING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SOLOMON , FERRIS G

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/30/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/30/2020:COMPLAINT

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3858842

12/31/2020:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3858842

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/31/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/12/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER REQUIRING REMOTE/ELECTRONIC APPEARANCES - 1/28/2021@10:30AM-JUDGE SHULLMAN DTD 1/20/21

01/20/2021:ORDER REQUIRING REMOTE/ELECTRONIC APPEARANCES - 1/28/2021@10:30AM-JUDGE SHULLMAN DTD 1/20/21

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

01/29/2021:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/09/2021:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 32195 PAGE 1911-1913

02/12/2021:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 32195 PAGE 1911-1913

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes:DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 32195 PAGE 1911-1913; Notes:AGAINST MICHAEL A. ROMACK CONTRACTING. INC. JUDGE SHULLMAN ON 2/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLT PRESENT PLT ATTY PRESENT DFT NO APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:ZOOM DIVISION RE (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REQUIRING REMOTE/ELECTRONIC APPEARANCES - 1/28/2021@10:30AM-JUDGE SHULLMAN DTD 1/20/21; Notes:REQUIRING REMOTE/ELECTRONIC APPEARANCES - 1/28/2021@10:30AM-JUDGE SHULLMAN DTD 1/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MICHAEL A ROMACK CONTRACTING INC - 01/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3858842; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/31/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/31/2020; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:FSOLOMON@GWMLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 1/28/2021 10:30 AM SHULLMAN, JUDGESARAH L; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 1/28/2021 10:30 AM SHULLMAN, JUDGESARAH L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3858842; Notes:$310.00 3858842 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIORITY TOWING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MICHAEL J COLEMAN AS TRUSTEE OF THE MICHAEL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLOMON , FERRIS G