This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/25/2022 at 15:17:44 (UTC).

PRIETO, KELLYS J V RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 PRIETO, KELLYS J filed an Other lawsuit against RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PRIETO , KELLYS J

Defendant and Respondent

RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BEBERGAL , MARC L

ROCA , RAFAEL J

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KATLER , MITCHELL H

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

02/22/2022:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

02/21/2022:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

CERTIFICATE

02/17/2022:CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

02/17/2022:NOTICE OF MEDIATION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/09/2022:REQUEST FOR COPIES

ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

02/04/2022:ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

02/04/2022:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

02/04/2022:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/03/2022:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

02/01/2022:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

01/27/2022:NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/25/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/23/2021:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

11/29/2021:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

11/29/2021:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

11/29/2021:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

11/12/2021:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

11/08/2021:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION; Notes:NOTICE OF MEDIATION 04/18/2022 01:00:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL; Notes:OFTEDAL; BEGINNING 10/24/2022 AND ENDING 12/16/2022 DTD 2/4/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/23/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4114898; Notes:$411.00 4114898 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST REQUEST TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:rroca@800goldlaw.com;cgordon@800goldlaw.com;hrodriguez@800goldlaw.com AS TO RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROCA , RAFAEL JORGE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bebergal, Marc L