This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/22/2022 at 18:55:36 (UTC).

PRIDE CLEAN RESTORATION INC. (A/A/O CHUN-JUNG HUANG) V UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 PRIDE CLEAN RESTORATION INC A/A/O CHUN-JUNG HUANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PRIDE CLEAN RESTORATION INC. (A/A/O CHUN-JUNG HUANG)

Defendant and Respondent

UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STORANI , SEAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/29/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/29/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/29/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/29/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/29/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4129491

08/05/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4129491

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32890 PAGE 1320-1320

09/14/2021:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32890 PAGE 1320-1320

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:6K (Main Branch)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes:DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32890 PAGE 1320-1320; Notes:SIGNED JUDGE GARRISON 9/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4129491; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/05/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/05/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:STORANILAW@GMAIL.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 9/14/2021 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 9/14/2021 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4129491; Notes:$310.00 4129491 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST OF DOCUMENTS- E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:FIRST SET- E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less