This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/30/2022 at 15:26:18 (UTC).

PREMIER WELLNESS CENTERS, AS ASSIGNEE OF JOSUE RAYMOND V PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 PREMIER WELLNESS CENTERS, AS ASSIGNEE OF JOSUE RAYMOND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PREMIER WELLNESS CENTERS, AS ASSIGNEE OF JOSUE RAYMOND

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KARTEN , LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/21/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/21/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4546484

07/22/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4546484

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/28/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/01/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: NB; Room: #1 (North Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 8/23/2022 9:31:00 AM due to; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: WITHOUT PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY 7/27/2022 CORPORATE DONNA MOCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4546484; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/22/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/22/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LINDSAY@KMWLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 8/23/2022 9:31 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 8/23/2022 9:31 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4546484; Notes: $65.00 4546484 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREMIER WELLNESS CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARTEN , LINDSAY