This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/27/2022 at 09:29:51 (UTC).

PREMIER AVIATION OF BOCA RATON LLC V BOCA AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE LLC

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 PREMIER AVIATION OF BOCA RATON LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BOCA AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ZUCKERMAN , ASHLEY and HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ZUCKERMAN , ASHLEY

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PREMIER AVIATION OF BOCA RATON LLC

Defendant and Respondent

BOCA AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KATZ ESQ, JASON D

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GOLDSTEIN , MARK B

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/24/2021:COMPLAINT

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4189445

09/27/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4189445

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/14/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

AGREED ORDER HARPER: ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. GRANTED - WITHIN 30 DAYS DTD 10-18-21

10/18/2021:AGREED ORDER HARPER: ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. GRANTED - WITHIN 30 DAYS DTD 10-18-21

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/26/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/08/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/08/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT F/B DFT

11/08/2021:MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT F/B DFT

ORDER GRANTING DFT'S MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT JUDGE HARPER DTD 12/14/21

12/14/2021:ORDER GRANTING DFT'S MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT JUDGE HARPER DTD 12/14/21

COMPLAINT

12/29/2021:COMPLAINT

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/10/2022:MOTION TO DISMISS

REPLY/RESPONSE

01/14/2022:REPLY/RESPONSE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/18/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ORDER SETTING HEARING

01/19/2022:ORDER SETTING HEARING

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/17/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO BOCA AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE LLC REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:HARPER: 5-31-22 AT 10:45AM ROOM 9D ON MOTION TO DISMISS DTD 1-18-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT, BOCA AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE, LLC'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTFF, PREMIER AVIATION OF BOCA RATON, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY/RESPONSE; Notes:IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:PREMIER AVIATION OF BOCA RATON LLC AMENDED COMPLAINT AN/OR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADING F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:AMENDED F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DFT'S MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT JUDGE HARPER DTD 12/14/21; Notes:DFT'S MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT JUDGE HARPER DTD 12/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT F/B DFT; Notes:FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:OF JAMES L WEINTRAUB AS CO COUNSEL FOR DFT BOCA AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE LLC F/B ATTY JAMES L WEINTRAUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 12/09/2021 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLT, PREMIER AVIATION OF BOCA RATON, LLC'S COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4189445; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/27/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/27/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4189445; Notes:$411.00 4189445 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jason@jkatzlaw.com;casey@jkatzlaw.com AS TO DFT BOCA AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOCA AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katz, Jason D