This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/25/2019 at 15:39:48 (UTC).

PR THE QUAYE OWNER, LLC DBA THE QUAYE AT PALM BEACH GARDENS V SHEETZ, EADEN

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 PR THE QUAYE OWNER, LLC DBA THE QUAYE AT PALM BEACH GARDENS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SHEETZ, EADEN. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PR THE QUAYE OWNER, LLC DBA THE QUAYE AT PALM BEACH GARDENS

Defendants and Respondents

SHEETZ , JOHN

SHEETZ , EADEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/31/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/31/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/29/2019:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/24/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3382769

10/22/2019:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3382769

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/21/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/21/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED JOHN SHEETZ - 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED EADEN SHEETZ - 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3382769; Notes:$205.00 3382769 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:dsetaro@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;service@barfieldpa.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:dsetaro@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;service@barfieldpa.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Receipt Number:3382769; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$205.00; total Amount Paid:$205.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Due Date:10/22/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Due Date:10/22/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Due Date:10/22/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less