This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/13/2023 at 22:45:21 (UTC).

POURCH, KEYESTA V REEVES, CAROLYN

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 POURCH, KEYESTA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against REEVES, CAROLYN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , GREGORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , GREGORY

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

POURCH , KEYESTA

POWELL , LAMONE

Defendant and Respondent

REEVES , CAROLYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

BRESSLER , IAN M

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GRUEBELE , SUSETTE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/04/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/04/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/04/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/04/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/04/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4732641

01/05/2023:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4732641

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/18/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/30/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/30/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/30/2023:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER EXTENDING TIME

02/07/2023:ORDER EXTENDING TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME; Notes: KEYSER; TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS GRANTED; DFT SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER DTD 2/7/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT - F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY SUSETTE GRUEBELE OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B ATTY SUSETTE GRUEBELE OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CAROLYN REEVES - 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4732641; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/05/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/05/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4732641; Notes: $411.00 4732641 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AA: Circuit Civil Central - AA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ian@ianbresslerlaw.com;cy@ianbresslerlaw.com;jason@hurtfirm.com ISSUED TO CAROLYN REEVES EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: F/B PLTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES F/B PLTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less