This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/14/2020 at 19:09:29 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC V SAMUDIO, ANA M

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAMUDIO, ANA M. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant and Respondent

SAMUDIO , ANA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FORNARO , MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

08/03/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER CANCELLING PRETRIAL HEARING ON 10/6/20 & INVOKING FLA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE -JUDGE GARRISON 7/27/2020

07/27/2020:ORDER CANCELLING PRETRIAL HEARING ON 10/6/20 & INVOKING FLA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE -JUDGE GARRISON 7/27/2020

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/24/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3679399

07/10/2020:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3679399

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

07/10/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

SUMMONS REQUESTED

07/10/2020:SUMMONS REQUESTED

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:6K (Main Branch); Notes:ORD-CANCEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCancelled SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney on 10/6/2020 1:15:00 PM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELLING PRETRIAL HEARING ON 10/6/20 & INVOKING FLA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE -JUDGE GARRISON 7/27/2020; Notes:CANCELLING PRETRIAL HEARING ON 10/6/20 & INVOKING FLA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE -JUDGE GARRISON 7/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ANA M SAMUDIO - 7/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3679399; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:LAWFIRMFL@RSIEH.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 10/6/2020 1:15 PM GARRISON, JUDGEEDWARD A; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 10/6/2020 1:15 PM GARRISON, JUDGEEDWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3679399; Notes:$185.00 3679399 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less