This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/27/2023 at 01:23:47 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC V OBERG, JASON R

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OBERG, JASON R. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

OBERG , JASON R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/23/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/23/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

02/23/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4790968

02/24/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4790968

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4790968; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LITIGATIONSERVICE@PORTFOLIORECOVERY.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 3/29/2023 1:30 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 3/29/2023 1:30 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4790968; Notes: $310.00 4790968 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less