This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/26/2022 at 15:16:21 (UTC).

POMPANO WELLNESS GROUP, INC. V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 POMPANO WELLNESS GROUP, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

POMPANO WELLNESS GROUP, INC.

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALK , KENNETH B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MEHTA , VIRAJ A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/17/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/17/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4469187

05/18/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4469187

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/06/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/10/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/10/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

06/21/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

06/22/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FB DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FB DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - 06/2/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4469187; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/18/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/18/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 6/21/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 6/21/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4469187; Notes: $185.00 4469187 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POMPANO WELLNESS GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALK ESQ, KENNETH B