This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/19/2022 at 19:01:06 (UTC).

POMPANO WELLNESS GROUP, INC. V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 POMPANO WELLNESS GROUP, INC filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYSON , MARNI and SURBER , MELANIE D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYSON , MARNI

SURBER , MELANIE D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

POMPANO WELLNESS GROUP, INC.

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALK , KENNETH B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MEHTA , VIRAJ A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/10/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS REQUESTED

05/10/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/10/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4460327

05/11/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4460327

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/23/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/03/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/03/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B VIRAJ A MEHTA OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - 05/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4460327; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/11/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4460327; Notes: $310.00 4460327 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POMPANO WELLNESS GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALK ESQ, KENNETH B