This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/10/2021 at 19:04:56 (UTC).

POMPANO SPINE CENTER, LLC A/A/O MARIE SEPTEMBRE V AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 POMPANO SPINE CENTER, LLC A/A/O MARIE SEPTEMBRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

POMPANO SPINE CENTER, LLC A/A/O MARIE SEPTEMBRE

Defendant and Respondent

AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FISCHETTI , MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/04/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

11/04/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 4239731

11/08/2021:PAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 4239731

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING VENUE

11/24/2021:ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING VENUE

ORDER RESETTING

12/08/2021:ORDER RESETTING

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

12/08/2021:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESETTING; Notes:SHOW CAUSE HEARING TO 1/18/22 @ 9:30 AM VIA ZOOM DTD 12/8/21 JUDGE R. CORLEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING VENUE; Notes:12/7/2021 AT 9:30 A.M. - SIGNED JUDGE CASTOR 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4239731; Receipt Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$55.00; total Amount Paid:$55.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/08/2021; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 12/7/2021 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 12/7/2021 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 4239731; Notes:$55.00 4239731 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where Pompano Spine Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fischetti, Michael James