This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/18/2021 at 19:06:53 (UTC).

POMPANO SPINE CENTER, LLC A/A/O ARNOLD DAVILMAR V ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 POMPANO SPINE CENTER, LLC A/A/O ARNOLD DAVILMAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

POMPANO SPINE CENTER, LLC A/A/O ARNOLD DAVILMAR

Defendant and Respondent

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

FISCHETTI , MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/14/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

10/14/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4212825

10/15/2021:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4212825

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/22/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4212825; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$65.00; total Amount Paid:$65.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/15/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/15/2021; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:MFPAESQ@GMAIL.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 11/30/2021 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 11/30/2021 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4212825; Notes:$65.00 4212825 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pompano Spine Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fischetti, Michael James