This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/20/2022 at 15:30:37 (UTC).

POLO LAKES APARTMENTS, LLC DBA POLO LAKES APARTMENTS V MICHEL, ROSENARA

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 POLO LAKES APARTMENTS, LLC DBA POLO LAKES APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MICHEL, ROSENARA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

POLO LAKES APARTMENTS, LLC DBA POLO LAKES APARTMENTS

Defendant and Respondent

MICHEL , ROSENARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/21/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

07/21/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4544932

07/21/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4544932

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/26/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/27/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/05/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

08/05/2022:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

08/05/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

08/09/2022:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33778 PAGE 1492-1492

08/11/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33778 PAGE 1492-1492

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

08/15/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes: FWD TO PBSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33778 PAGE 1492-1492; Notes: SIGNED BY JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 8/11/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: IN RE ROSENARA MICHEL AND AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT OF RENT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: FOR EVICTION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: BY CLERK F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED ROSENARA MICHEL - 07/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4544932; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/21/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/21/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4544932; Notes: $195.00 4544932 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POLO LAKES APARTMENTS LLC DBA POLO LAKES APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN