This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 15:05:58 (UTC).

POLO LAKES APARTMENTS LLC DBA POLO LAKES APARTMENTS V HOUSER, JAROD

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 POLO LAKES APARTMENTS LLC DBA POLO LAKES APARTMENTS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HOUSER, JAROD. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS , SHERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS , SHERRI L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

POLO LAKES APARTMENTS LLC DBA POLO LAKES APARTMENTS

Defendants and Respondents

HOUSER , JAROD

GRAHAM , FRAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/09/2019:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/08/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/01/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/01/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3223798

06/26/2019:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3223798

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

06/25/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED FRAN GRAHAM - 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED JAROD.HOUSER - 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3223798; Notes:$205.00 3223798 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:dsetaro@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;service@barfieldpa.com FRAN GRAHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:dsetaro@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;service@barfieldpa.com JAROD HOUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Receipt Number:3223798; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$205.00; total Amount Paid:$205.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Due Date:06/26/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Due Date:06/26/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Due Date:06/26/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN