This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/31/2019 at 15:05:03 (UTC).

POLO LAKES APARTMENTS LLC DBA POLO LAKES APARTMENTS V BENJAMIN, COURTNEY

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 POLO LAKES APARTMENTS LLC DBA POLO LAKES APARTMENTS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BENJAMIN, COURTNEY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS , SHERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS , SHERRI L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

POLO LAKES APARTMENTS LLC DBA POLO LAKES APARTMENTS

Defendant and Respondent

BENJAMIN , COURTNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION

07/17/2019:SATISFACTION

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30755 PAGE 709-710

07/15/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30755 PAGE 709-710

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/15/2019:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

CLERK'S DEFAULT

07/12/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/10/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

07/10/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/10/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/01/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/28/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3225833

06/27/2019:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3225833

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

06/26/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/26/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION; Notes:OF JUDGMENT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30755 PAGE 709-710; Notes:FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AND ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO "CLOSE" THE FILE (FJUD). SIGNED ON 7/15/19 BY JDG S. COLLINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:AND AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT OF RENT. F/B PLT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION. F/B PLT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:F/B PLT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED COURTNEY BENJAMIN - 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3225833; Notes:$195.00 3225833 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:dsetaro@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;service@barfieldpa.com COURTNEY BENJAMIN. EISSUED TO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes:COUNT I - EVICTION OF RESIDENTIAL TENANT. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Receipt Number:3225833; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$195.00; total Amount Paid:$195.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Due Date:06/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Due Date:06/27/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN