This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/29/2022 at 22:47:50 (UTC).

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION V MCKENZIE, FENTON W

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MCKENZIE, FENTON W. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DELGADO , LUIS and HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DELGADO , LUIS

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Respondents

MCKENZIE , FENTON W

THE ESTATES OF ROYAL PALM BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCI

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FENTON W MCKENZIE

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CONFREDA , RALPH W

ULLMAN , ZACHARY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TRECO , WILLIAM A

LEE , SCOTT J.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/24/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

08/18/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

08/17/2022:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/10/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/10/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/05/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/02/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/30/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

07/29/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/20/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS

07/20/2022:LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

07/20/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/20/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AS CO-COUNSEL F/B ATTY RALPH W CONFEDA OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FENTON W. MCKENZIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes: AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FENTON W MCKENZIE, UNKNOWN TENANT #1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT #2 - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFT MCKENZIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: FILED BY DFT MCKENZIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS F/B ATTY WILLIAM A TRECO OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FENTON W MCKENZIE - 07/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE ESTATES OF ROYAL PALM BEACH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC - 07/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FENTON W MCKENZIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: PURSANT TO RULE 2.516 F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@aldridgepite.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT #2 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@aldridgepite.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us AS TO UNKNOEN TENANT #1 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@aldridgepite.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us AS TO ESTATES OF ROYAL PALM BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@aldridgepite.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FENTON W MCKENZIE EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@aldridgepite.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us AS TO FENTON W MCKENZIE EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33727 PAGE 1018-1018; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED FOR RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESTATES OF ROYAL PALM BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RALPH W CONFREDA JR, ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ullman, Zachary Y.